EPISTEMIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Epistemic aims to ensure that all young people in the UK, regardless of their geographical location, have the opportunity to engage with professionals working in STEM in order to inspire and encourage them to pursue STEM careers. We do this by providing a free service connecting schools and youth groups directly to STEM professionals via a virtual platform.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Louise Harker | Chair | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lequan Hoang | Trustee | 09 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anika Rajen Ved | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Kate Gibbs | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Holmes | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Ian James Taylor-MacLean | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hoang | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 298 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 298 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH WORKSHOPS AND SESSIONS IN SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING AND MATHEMATICS TOPICS AND CAREERS AS A MEANS OF: A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Burrows Close
Penn
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP10 8AR
- Phone:
- 07898018950
- Email:
- contact@epistemic.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window