Governing document THE GEORGE WARD CHARITABLE TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 OCTOBER 1985 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 7 SEPTEMBER 1998 AND 6 MAY 1999.
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST PERSONS BEING IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE WHO HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED BY GEORGE WARD (BARWELL) LTD AND GEORGE GEARY AND SON LTD FOR A PERIOD OF NOT LESS THAN 3 CONSECUTIVE MONTHS BETWEEN THE 1 NOVEMBER 1941 AND THE 31 JANUARY 1984 OR WHO ARE THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH EMPLOYEES. (B) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN WRITING DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE THE AREA COMPRISED BY THE HINCKLEY AND BOSWORTH BOROUGH COUNCIL IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE GENERAL INTENTION OF THE SETTLOR.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.