THE MARTIN MORAN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Climbing and Mountaineering instructional courses for young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 January 2021: CIO registration
- MARTIN MORAN FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- MARTIN MORAN FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alex James Moran | Chair | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Stuart Dring | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Geraint Talbot | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Moran | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Roslyn Francis | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Jemima Moran | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.88k | £43.40k | £73.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.36k | £26.97k | £33.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 09 December 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 09 December 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, AGED 16 - 18, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH: THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SPECIFICALLY MOUNTAINEERING AND CLIMBING TRAINING, WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS, SCHOLARSHIPS ON OUTDOOR EDUCATION COURSES RUN BY THE CIO.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Pinefield
CARRBRIDGE
Inverness-Shire
PH23 3BL
- Phone:
- 07883616561
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window