BUILD STUDIOS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Build Studios is a hub for the built environment. We aim to inspire young people about the design of towns and cities through collaboration and learning. We work within our community to improve understanding of the built environment and access to careers in the sector for young people. We deliver events, seminars and networking to inspire people and share best practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 August 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN RUSHTON | Chair | 09 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Ben Michael Rowlatt | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maxwell Mutanda | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Rupert Moyne | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penny Alexander | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
GIANMARIA GIVANNI | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
IDOWU OLUWASEUN OLANREWAJU GBOLADE | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
IBRAHIM BUHARI | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Palmer Smith | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £58.95k | £79.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £57.11k | £73.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 November 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 AUG 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: A. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 30 LIVING IN ENGLAND BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ON THE THEMES OF THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT, ARCHITECTURE, DESIGN, CONSTRUCTION, TOWN PLANNING, DEVELOPMENT, URBAN MANAGEMENT, BUSINESS AND ENTREPRENEURIAL SKILLS AND RELATED DISCIPLINES, AS A MEANS OF: I) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; II) ADVANCING EDUCATION; III) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT. B. TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES BY PROVIDING CHARITIES (WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE INVOLVED WITH THE SUBJECT AREAS SPECIFIED AT A ABOVE) WITH OFFICE AND/OR MEETING SPACE ON A NON-COMMERCIAL BASIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUILD STUDIOS
203 WESTMINSTER BRIDGE ROAD
LONDON
SE1 7FR
- Phone:
- 02038971999
- Email:
- hello@buildstudios.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window