THE GENIES WISH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving relief and assistance in need for people aged between Birth and 40 years of age with a chronic or critical condition including terminal illnesses with a treasured wish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsey Stedman | Chair | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Darren Sharp | Trustee | 26 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Garvie Reekie | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Patricia Gray | Trustee | 06 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.75k | £218.80k | £337.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.14k | £127.17k | £248.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE A DIAGNOSED CHRONIC OR CRITICAL MEDICAL CONDITION, INCLUDING TERMINAL ILLNESSES AGED BETWEEN 0-40 AND THE CARERS OF SUCH PEOPLE AGED 5-16 BY GRANTING FEASIBLE WISHES AND PROVIDING SPECIAL EVENTS AND EXPERIENCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 61
Basepoint Centre
Harts Farm Way
HAVANT
Hampshire
PO9 1HS
- Phone:
- 07717533418
- Email:
- info@genieswish.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window