Trustees SANDY HILL STUDIOS TRUST CIO
Charity number: 1193387

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melissa Viney | Chair | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Pitcher | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nyah Boston-Shears | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elena Jean Greer | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Helen Starmer | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Pollard | Trustee | 28 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jeffery | Trustee | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Charlotte Ormond | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.