HESWALL CENTRE PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising small scale activities for Parents and Friends and members of the local communities eg dances, quizzes, cheese and wine events, to raise funds for the benefit of the Heswall Centre and kindred associations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wirral
Governance
- 28 November 1985: Standard registration
- HESWALL ADULT TRAINING CENTRE PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Linnane | Chair | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANE MAGNER | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
JUNE ELIZABETH SWINDLES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.30k | £4.38k | £0 | £1.33k | £1.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.35k | £5.20k | £0 | £866 | £8.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MARCH 1985 AS AMENDED 27 APRIL 1992 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/06/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WITH LEARNING OR OTHER DISABILITIES OF ALL AGES ATTENDING OR HAVING ATTENDED HESWALL CENTRE (INCLUDING ANY APPROPRIATE SUCCESSOR ORGANISATIONS OR RELEVANT SERVICES APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES AS MEETING THIS OBJECT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OF OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING WITH STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, INSTITUTIONS, BUSINESSES AND INDIVIDUALS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND LIFE SKILLS OF SERVICE USERS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THEIR HEALTH, RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE ASSOCIATIONS SERVICE USERS AND TO PROMOTE ALL OR ANY OBJECTS FOR THEIR BENEFIT WHICH MAY NOW OR HEREAFTER BE DEEMED AT LAW TO BE CHARITABLE. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON POLITICAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Wirral Close
Bebington
Wirral
Merseyside
CH63 3BJ
- Phone:
- 07813162019
- Email:
- peterlinnane53@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window