RACHEL'S TABLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN LEICESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, WHO ARE HOMELESS, ROUGH SLEEPING OR VULNERABLY HOUSED BY PROVIDING FOOD, CLOTHING, SUPPLIES AND SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND ADVISORY SERVICES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 08 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carl Ronald Morris | Chair | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Peckett | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Grace Morris | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander William Morris | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Alison Morris | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Ronald Morris | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Rebecca Woodward | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALISON BRIGGS | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN SAMUEL OWEN | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.71k | £41.82k | £33.49k | £48.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.24k | £22.65k | £31.75k | £37.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN LEICESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, WHO ARE HOMELESS, ROUGH SLEEPING OR VULNERABLY HOUSED BY PROVIDING FOOD, CLOTHING, SUPPLIES AND SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND ADVISORY SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 De Montfort Street
LEICESTER
LE1 7GB
- Phone:
- 07405439667
- Email:
- info@rachels-table.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window