THE KEEPERS - WOTTON AREA COMMUNITY HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Keepers is a community hub supporting the needs of residents of Wotton and surrounding areas, helping them to be more connected to the services, groups and professionals that can provide support for health, wellbeing or financial hardship issues. We host a number of professional organisations and classes, run our own drop-in cafe and community garden, and have a dry food store and freezer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £44,595 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 02 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shaenna Loughnane | Chair | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally-Anne Barnes | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David John Lewis Mr | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rumley | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Graham | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gail Stephens Tuffee Mrs | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Braun Mrs | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Hearn Mrs | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Britton-Griffiths Mrs | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.96k | £75.52k | £196.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.14k | £75.57k | £127.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £41.65k | £26.67k | £44.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (I)TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (II)TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY HUB (HEREINAFTER CALLED “THE KEEPERS”) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008] .
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Keepers
THE KEEPERS
SYMN LANE
WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE
Gloucestershire
GL12 7BD
- Phone:
- 07545042794
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window