THE CRAIG TYLER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide mental health support and suicide prevention services. We support families who have been bereaved by suicide. We have a twice weekly drop in center within the Basildon Borough for people who need support or are at crisis point.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £43,831 from 5 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 November 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
karen pullen | Chair | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Mc Laughlin | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Faye Dixie | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Tyler | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
casey pullen | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Stanton-hope | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.37k | £102.75k | £197.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.83k | £110.08k | £124.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.82k | £16.16k | £43.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 05 November 2024 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 October 2022 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 24 October 2022 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 24 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN BASILDON AND THE LOCAL AREA EXPERIENCING OR AT RISK OF POOR MENTAL HEALTH THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS BY PROVIDING A PEER SUPPORT AND A COMMUNITY DROP IN FACILITY TO PROVIDE A SAFE SOCIAL ENVIRONMENT, PROVIDING SUPPORT THROUGH COMPANIONSHIP, PEER SUPPORT, INFORMATION, ADVICE, GUIDANCE, SIGNPOSTING AND ACTING AS A CATALYST FOR INVOLVEMENT AND PARTICIPATION, ENCOURAGING PEOPLE TO DEVELOP THEIR OWN SOLUTIONS TO CHALLENGING PROBLEMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cottages E&F Wat Tyler Country Park
Pitsea Hall Lane
Pitsea
BASILDON
Essex
SS16 4UH
- Phone:
- 07745331925
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window