YOUNG CLIMATE WARRIORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of children and young people in subjects relating to global environmental change and ways to prevent or reduce the impacts of climate change; and To promote, for the public benefit, the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 November 2020: CIO registration
- 01 July 2024: Funds received from 1149279 DEVELOPMENT IN ACTION
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katrina Judge | Chair | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Henry Wilson | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Laurence Fisher | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Austin | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Mead | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Finnan | Trustee | 29 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Fleur Wells | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.72k | £12.88k | £10.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.54k | £16.77k | £23.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES OF THE CIO, BEING UNDERTAKEN FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UK AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD, ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO GLOBAL ENVIRONMENTAL CHANGE AND WAYS TO PREVENT OR REDUCE THE IMPACTS OF CLIMATE CHANGE; AND (B) TO PROMOTE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH INFORMATION AND INSTRUCTION ABOUT GLOBAL ENVIRONMENTAL CHANGE AND ENCOURAGING THEM TO FIND WAYS TO PREVENT OR REDUCE THE IMPACTS OF CLIMATE CHANGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fishers
Shepherds Green
Rotherfield Greys
Henley-on-Thames
RG9 4QL
- Phone:
- 01491628082
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window