ANDALUCIA LEARNING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPECIALISING IN EXTRACURRICULAR EDUCATION AND ACTIVITIES FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS. ACTIVITIES SUCH AS TEACHING MODERN FOREIGN LANGUAGES ( ARABIC, FRENCH AND SPANISH), HEALTH AND MENTAL WELL-BEING, ELECTRONICS AND CODING, WOODWORK AND DIY SKILLS, GARDENING AND BUSHCRAFT. YOUTH ACTIVITIES SUCH AS CRAFTS. FORM-FILLING APPLICATION HELP AND DIGITAL ASSISTANCE TO REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
Total income includes £15,053 from 5 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
Governance
- 24 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fardausi Chawdhry | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Soumas | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sobia Bibi | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | £22.56k | £20.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £16.94k | £19.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.80k | £15.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Nov 2020 as amended on 25 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
EDUCATIONAL OBJECTIVE: - TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF [LANGUAGES]. - TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF TUITION [OF THE NATIONAL CURRICULUM] FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.Ö RELIGIOUS OBJECTIVE: - THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE [ISLAM] RELIGION MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING [ISLAMIC MORAL AND SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT] TEACHING NATURE. - TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE [SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY]DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF [ ROCHDALE] IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETYÖ
Area of benefit
ROCHDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
137A milnrow road
rochdale
ol16 5dl
ol165dl
- Phone:
- 01706569196
- Email:
- andalucia.lc@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window