EKARTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of Ekarta is the promotion of equality and diversity within graphic design, specifically in relation to the greeting card sector for the industry's benefit as well as for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keji Okeowo | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Faye Duncan | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ophelia Debrah | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suman Sandhu | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 May 2022 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF EKARTA IS THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WITHIN GRAPHIC DESIGN, SPECIFICALLY IN RELATION TO THE GREETING CARD SECTOR FOR THE INDUSTRY'S BENEFIT AS WELL AS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
125 SOUTHGATE ROAD
LONDON
125 Southgate Road
N1 3JY
- Phone:
- 07401150102
- Email:
- info@ekarta.co.uk
- Website:
-
ekarta.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window