SAXILBY CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1193358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Saxilby School PTA funds a variety of activities throughout the year which compliment and enrich the education the pupils receive. In addition to these experiences, the PTA strives to make a meaningful and lasting impact on the learning environments at our school by helping to fund equipment and capital improvements.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 25 August 2024

Total income: £8,639
Total expenditure: £4,354

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 February 2021: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Victoria Cherry Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Imogen Wraith Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/08/2021 25/08/2022 25/08/2023 25/08/2024
Total gross income £7.52k £5.64k £6.43k £8.64k
Total expenditure £5.08k £13.72k £5.57k £4.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 August 2024 27 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 25 August 2023 27 February 2025 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 25 August 2022 25 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 25 August 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 August 2021 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SAXILBY C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
HIGHFIELD ROAD
SAXILBY
LINCOLN
LN1 2QJ
Phone:
01522702669
Website:

No information available