IONA SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING EDUCATION ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF RUDOLF STEINER FOR PRIMARY SCHOOL AGED CHILDREN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 22 November 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HANNAH MALHOTRA | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Teresa Gilbertson | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Taylor | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Louise Lipman | Trustee | 16 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £622.37k | £504.87k | £433.66k | £432.99k | £472.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £612.62k | £490.80k | £503.95k | £476.16k | £454.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.77k | £4.50k | £4.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £14.00k | £42.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £30.99k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £576.93k | £426.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £444 | £168 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £2.05k | £35.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £9.89k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £602.50k | £489.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.89k | £992 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £6.23k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 MAY 1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2 OCTOBER 1985
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR AND CONDUCT THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND METHODS ENUNCIATED BY RUDOLF STEINER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
IRWIN MITCHELL
2 WELLINGTON PLACE
LEEDS
LS1 4BZ
- Phone:
- 01132206211
- Website:
-
IRWINMITCHELL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window