BELULA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Belula's core aim is to elevate the physical, psychological, social and economic living standards of the most economically deprived children across South America in order to secure access to fundamental human rights.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Venezuela
Governance
- 09 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natalia Carolina Gauna Lozano | Chair | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leonardo Gonzalez Alcala | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG ORPHANS, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, LIVING IN VENEZUELA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD, HEALTH AND HYGIENE PRODUCTS, MEDICINE, BEDDING AND CLOTHING AND OTHER ITEMS AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. (2) THE PRESERVATION AND PROMOTION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AMONG ORPHANS, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, LIVING IN VENEZUELA BY PROVIDING PSYCHOLOGICAL AND PSYCHIATRIC SUPPORT TO THOSE WHO HAVE HAD ADVERSE CHILDHOOD EXPERIENCES
Contact information
- Address:
-
KEMP HOUSE 160
CITY ROAD
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07522761469
- Email:
- hola@belula.co.uk
- Website:
-
BELULA.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window