Trustees POCKLINGTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 517000

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Ann Ball | Chair | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alice Margaret Reid | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesa Newman | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bell | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Watson | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Elizabeth Dobson | Trustee | 10 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET HARA | Trustee | 19 February 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.