BRADFORD CULTURE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the arts and heritage for the benefit of the public within the city of Bradford and to advance the arts, in particular the arts of performance, music, drama, poetry reading, sculpture, painting, handicrafts and all other associated arts, by encouraging public participation by supporting the arts and heritage sector through promotion, representation and development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£6,286,779
Donations and legacies | £5.98m | |
Charitable activities | £309.45k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,162,927
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £4.16m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,675,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.16m | |
Retained for future use | £2.12m |
People

75 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
106 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 5 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
Governance
- 26 May 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kersten England | Chair | 25 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Asif Qasim | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Ruth Ibegbuna | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander James Hudson | Trustee | 12 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sasha Bhat | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debra Alison Jukes | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Dewhurst | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phil Batty | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melany Pickup | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sabbiyah Pervez | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adeeba Malik | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stuart McKinnon-Evans | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Kamran | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Dowson | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £996.80k | £1.50m | £6.29m | |
|
Total expenditure | £698.33k | £888.33k | £4.16m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £852.72k | £1.28m | £3.68m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £130.25k | £1.39m | £5.98m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £866.55k | £115.08k | £309.45k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £698.33k | £888.33k | £4.16m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.40k | £5.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £470 | £15.66k | £304.24k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £326.16k | £1.10m | £3.28m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £28.15k | £203.55k | £545.34k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 NOV 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 AUG 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 MAY 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 MAY 2021
Charitable objects
2.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND THE ARTISTIC AND CULTURAL HERITAGE OF THE CITY OF BRADFORD AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF PERFORMANCE, MUSIC, DRAMA, POETRY READING, SCULPTURE, PAINTING, HANDICRAFTS AND ALL OTHER ASSOCIATED ARTS; 2.2 TO ADVANCE THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF PERFORMANCE, MUSIC, DRAMA, POETRY READING, SCULPTURE, PAINTING, HANDICRAFTS AND ALL OTHER ASSOCIATED ARTS, BY ENCOURAGING PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE SAID ARTS AND BY THE PRESENTATION OF PERFORMANCES, EXHIBITIONS AND FESTIVALS PROVIDED THAT THE PROMOTION OF SUCH FESTIVALS AND EVENTS IS UNDERTAKEN SOLELY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND 2.3 TO PROMOTE THE ARTS AND HERITAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE CITY OF BRADFORD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING THE ARTS AND HERITAGE SECTOR THROUGH PROMOTION, REPRESENTATION AND DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Schofield Sweeney Solicitors
Church Bank House
Church Bank
Bradford
BD1 4DY
- Phone:
- 01274800551
- Email:
- info@bradford2025.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window