EIG CANCER RESEARCH & SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing grants for the advancement of education in the field of cancer research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Greece
Governance
- 05 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Spiros Giamas | Chair | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Menelaos Giamas | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Soteriou | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Christou | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Piero Soteriou | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.19k | £3.42k | £14.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.64k | £24.77k | £23.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO ASSIST INDIVIDUALS IN FURTHERING THEIR POST GRADUATE STUDIES AND RESEARCH IN THE FIELD OF CANCER RELATED STUDIES AND RESEARCH AT RECOGNIZED UNIVERSITIES, COLLEGES, HOSPITALS, RESEARCH ORGANISATIONS AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AND TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO THOSE INSTITUTIONS IN CONNECTION WITH CANCER RELATED STUDIES AND RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
253 Gray's Inn Road
London
WC1X 8QT
- Phone:
- 02072788251
- Email:
- info@eig-foundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window