HOFENUNG FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE RACIAL TOLERANCE AND ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION, IN PARTICULAR ANTI-SEMITISM BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDING AND OTHER SUPPORT TO CHARITIES, ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS AND THE PROMOTION OF EFFECTIVE INTERVENTIONS AND APPROACHES THAT SEEK TO PREVENT, COUNTER AND ADDRESS SUCH RACIAL INTOLERANCE AND DISCRIMINATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 November 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Lord Jonathan Neil Mendelsohn | Chair | 23 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Tracey Allen MBE | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Sir Trevor Chinn | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.80k | £71.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.52k | £61.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 SEP 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE RACIAL TOLERANCE AND ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION, IN PARTICULAR ANTI-SEMITISM BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDING AND OTHER SUPPORT TO CHARITIES, ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS AND THE PROMOTION OF EFFECTIVE INTERVENTIONS AND APPROACHES THAT SEEK TO PREVENT, COUNTER AND ADDRESS SUCH RACIAL INTOLERANCE AND DISCRIMINATION. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THAT SUCH ACTIVITIES ARE NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
69-73 THEOBALDS ROAD
LONDON
WC1X 8TA
- Phone:
- 07889424441
- Email:
- info@hofenung.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window