THE GENERATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation makes grants to charities and non-profit bodies in furtherance of its charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe Cronin | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Nicholas Headley | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Meg Joelle Headley | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25m | £1.00m | £9.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.25k | £1.12m | £415.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.25m | £1.00m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £120.25k | £1.12m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.25k | £6.09k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £115.00k | £1.11m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Womble Bond Dickinson UK LLP
The Spark
Draymans Way
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE4 5DE
- Phone:
- 0345 415 0000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window