PHOENIX DOG RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS DOGS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE FOR DOGS NEEDING CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, ILL USAGE AND TO FIND RESCUE HOMES. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS PARTICULARLY DOGS
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Deluce | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Megan Evans | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Gregson | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christine Roberts | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 915 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 915 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O ROSE TREE FARM BOARDING KENNEL
WIDNES ROAD
CUERDLEY
WARRINGTON
WA5 2UR
- Phone:
- 07478699352
- Email:
- rescued_dogs@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window