CENTRAL FOUNDATION BOYS' SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education for the public benefit through the provision of support to Central Foundation Boys' School and its pupils, including (without limitation) through the support of the maintenance, enhancement or improvement of facilities, resources and educational opportunities at the School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Islington
Governance
- 16 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fatima Rayner | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Wardrop | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Chin | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Hamwood | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Dodds | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Jamie Brownhill | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £10 | £13.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT TO THE SCHOOL AND ITS PUPILS, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) THROUGH THE SUPPORT OF THE MAINTENANCE, ENHANCEMENT OR IMPROVEMENT OF FACILITIES, RESOURCES AND EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES AT THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CENTRAL FOUNDATION BOYS SCHOOL
COWPER STREET
LONDON
EC2A 4SH
- Phone:
- 02072533741
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window