CHERISH THE CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support the education of children living in the socially and economically deprived areas in, Nakuru, Kenya and the Cherish School through the provision of funding to support new schools and develop existing schools. Financial support is also provided for individuals to access or continue with their education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kenya
Governance
- 27 October 2020: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL KEITH PERCH | Chair | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Douglas | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jean Robinson | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jenefer Clarke | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.89k | £14.10k | £4.23k | £20.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.81k | £6.89k | £7.39k | £14.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 AUG 2019 AS AMENDED ON 23 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN FROM THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF RHONDA, NAKURU, KENYA AND THE CHERISH SCHOOL, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FUNDING TO SUPPORT NEW SCHOOLS, DEVELOP EXISTING SCHOOLS,FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR INDIVIDUALS TO ACCESS OR CONTINUE WITH THEIR EDUCATION AND THROUGH SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DEEM APPROPRIATE. [NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT(SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND)2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 NASEBY ROAD
BELPER
DE56 0ER
- Phone:
- 01773825835
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window