Financial history 69TH SHEFFIELD (MOSBOROUGH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 517015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.23k £0 £3.75k £3.84k £1.43k
Total expenditure £4.68k £1.25k £3.00k £3.41k £2.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A