BETHESDA APOSTOLIC EAGLES-INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- to advance the Christian religion in accordance with the Holy Bible in Luton and anywhere within the UK/world. - to promote social cohesion within the community by organising events and working with local charitable organisations - to visiting/comfort the sick - to carry out weddings, funerals, baby blessings, house blessings etc - to help those in need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Luton
- Reading
- Slough
- Solihull
Governance
- 25 January 2021: CIO registration
- 16 August 2023: Funds received from 1098578 BETHEL UNITED CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST (APOSTOLIC) L...
- BETHEL APOSTOLIC CHURCH-SLOUGH (Working name)
- BETHESDA EAGLES NEST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bishop David Lewin | Chair | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Samms | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Lewin | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dellecia Smith-Dawkins | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Derby | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.96k | £72.63k | £90.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.48k | £75.61k | £78.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE HOLY BIBLE THROUGH THE CHURCH BY FAITH IN SUCH WAYS IN LUTON AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM FIT. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
253 Marsh Road
Luton
LU3 2RT
- Phone:
- 01582945614
- Email:
- churchadmin@bethesda-aei.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window