STOKE ON TRENT LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1192273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

. The charity serves the local community by helping people who are elderly, disabled and or disadvantaged. They make grants to individuals, local organisations and national and international appeals Support is also offered to improve the physical and natural environment. They raise funds from public donations and the provision of events such as carnivals,fetes firework displays and similar.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £56,264
Total expenditure: £51,415

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Stoke-on-trent City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM JOHN HODGKINSON Trustee 11 November 2020
None on record
KATHERINE MARY JOHNSON Trustee 11 November 2020
None on record
Barbara Jane Martin Trustee 11 November 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £27.10k £46.55k £43.69k £56.26k
Total expenditure £714 £35.74k £48.81k £51.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 20 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 20 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 02 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 02 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 24 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 24 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 05 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 05 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
32 PARIS AVENUE
NEWCASTLE
ST5 2RQ
Phone:
03458335724