GREATER MANCHESTER DRAMA FEDERATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim is to promote amateur theatre in and across the greater manchester area together with updates of legal and national requirements, this involves approximately 60 societies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 28 January 1986: Standard registration
- 09 January 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 04 October 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL COHEN | Chair | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Cameron Chandler | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Jane Taylor | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Hazel Philips | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Harris | Trustee | 19 August 2016 |
|
|||||
JUDITH CRAIG | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|||||
STELLA CONSTANCE BLACKBURN | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|||||
GERALD LENNOX | Trustee | 30 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.96k | £0 | £8.53k | £9.52k | £15.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.53k | £0 | £13.62k | £8.53k | £10.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 August 2022 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 OCTOER 1985 AS AMENDED ON 14 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE AESTHETIC TASTES OF THE PUBLIC AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC ARTS THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF AMATEUR THEATRE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
379 CHESTER ROAD
WOODFORD
STOCKPORT
SK7 1QQ
- Phone:
- 0161 440 0118
- Email:
- jude@gmdf.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window