KNOW AFRICA CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established in 2018, Know Africa CIO is a registered charity dedicated to supporting, empowering, and celebrating the wide cultural diaspora of African people living in Manchester and beyond. Know Africa is committed to its role as a resource for African people, their traditions, and their unique identities to be visible and have a voi
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
Total income includes £68,587 from 5 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 15 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tabitha Ngabwa | Chair | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Vubo | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jefwa Rose | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.00k | £52.35k | £68.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.42k | £53.12k | £70.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £52.35k | £68.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 April 2024
(These accounts |
31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 19 May 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 19 May 2024 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF WYTHENSHAWE AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS OF GREATER MANCHESTER, AND ALSO THE PEOPLE OF AFRICA: 1, THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY BY PARTICULARLY BUT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND HEALTH RELATED PROJECTS. 2, THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION, BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR SOCIAL INTERACTION AND THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wythenshawe Fm
Hale Top
Civic Centre
Wythenshawe
MANCHESTER
M22 5RQ
- Phone:
- 07588514865
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window