E5 BABY AND CHILDREN BANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hackney Children & Baby Bank supports families in need in Hackney and surrounding areas by providing essential items for babies and primary school age children from donated items and funds raised. We provide clothes, shoes, toys, nappies, toiletries, buggies, cots and other baby equipment, as well as advice and support and signposting to other local services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 November 2020: CIO registration
- Hackney Children and Baby Bank (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Thackray | Chair | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Oyineze Wilson-Obeneme | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Morgan | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Boardman | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elena Strbac | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bolanle Ibilola | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Margaret Watmough | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Mitchell | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dayanthy Beautine Wester | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Giffen | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.66k | £81.92k | £73.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.80k | £61.93k | £60.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BECAUSE OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CLOTHING, FOOD AND OTHER SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO PREGNANT WOMEN, BABIES, CHILDREN AND THEIR CARE GIVERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
174 Homerton High Street
Homerton
London
E9 6AG
- Phone:
- 07840843361
- Email:
- hello@hackneybabybank.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window