MOMENTUM CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
On 30.06.2022 we converted from a Trust (Reg 1106677) to a CIO. Our activities have not changed. We support children with life challenging conditions, and their families, across London, Surrey and Sussex by providing tailored support, in hospital and at home. Copies of recent Trustee Reports and Financial Statements may be found at https://www.momentumcharity.org/about/our-impact/
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income:
£1,192,666
Donations and legacies | £804.96k | |
Charitable activities | £323.63k | |
Other trading activities | £39.91k | |
Investments | £24.17k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,122,377
Raising funds | £211.02k | |
Charitable activities | £911.36k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £211.02k | |
Charitable expenditure | £911.36k | |
Retained for future use | £70.29k |
People

19 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 November 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Smith | Chair | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lawrence Read | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Johnson | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Patterson | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kate Irwin | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Loveless | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michele Settle | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
KIERON LYNCH | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Mario Bodini | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victor De Cruz | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.03m | £1.19m | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.15m | £1.12m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £734.56k | £804.96k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £38.82k | £39.91k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £257.24k | £323.63k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £2.52k | £24.17k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £26.87k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £907.16k | £911.36k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £220.01k | £211.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £11.14k | £11.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £301.81k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £1.16k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £21.25k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £327.36k | £305.48k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £672.24k | £768.53k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £41.30k | £45.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN WITH CANCER AND LIFE-CHALLENGING CONDITIONS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN LONDON AND THE SOUTH-EAST THROUGH THE PROVISION OF DIRECT SUPPORT, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND SUPPORT SERVICES AT HOME AND IN HOSPITAL AS WELL AS PROVIDING HOLIDAY HOMES FOR RESPITE, DAYS OUT AND OTHER ACTIVITIES IN THE COMMUNITY. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN WITH CANCER AND OTHER LIFE-CHALLENGING CONDITIONS AT KINGSTON HOSPITAL AND OTHER LOCAL HOSPITALS IN LONDON AND THE SOUTH-EAST BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES. TO OFFER BEREAVEMENT SUPPORT TO FAMILIES WHOSE CHILDREN HAVE DIED AS A RESULT OF CANCER AND LIFE-CHALLENGING CONDITIONS IN LONDON AND THE SOUTH-EAST.
Linked charities
- 10 November 2004 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
11A Creek Road
EAST MOLESEY
Surrey
KT8 9BE
- Phone:
- 02089745931
- Email:
- info@momentumcharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window