HOPE for Epilepsy

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOPE for Paediatric Epilepsy - London is a small award winning charity that supports families with children and young people affected by epilepsy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
Governance
- 19 November 2020: Standard registration
- 09 August 2022: Funds received from 1058958 F.A.B.L.E (FOR A BETTER LIFE WITH EPILEPSY)
- HOPE LONDON (Working name)
- HOPE FOR PAEDIATRIC EPILEPSY - LONDON (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Nadine Jane Gurr | Chair | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Felix Chan | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon David Hughes | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
LISA JAYNE O'BRIEN | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charles Andrew Steward | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Christine Miller | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Catrina Wood | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Lorayne Ryan | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Graeme Cox | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophie Danielle Bennett | Trustee | 02 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.31k | £14.80k | £73.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.89k | £12.79k | £33.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 2020 as amended on 01 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING WITH EPILEPSY AND THEIR PARENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION, RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAKLEIGH SCHOOL
OAKLEIGH ROAD NORTH
LONDON
N20 0DH
- Phone:
- 07516926703
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window