Accounts and annual returns THE LIVERPOOL MOTORISTS' ANNUAL OUTING

Charity number: 517026
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2011 20 March 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 20 March 2012 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 01 November 2010 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 01 November 2010 1 days late
Annual return 31 December 2008 25 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required