CITY OF MANCHESTER AQUATICS SWIM TEAM

Charity Number: 1195630
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation, primarily but not exclusively, for the benefit of the inhabitants of Manchester and the surrounding areas by the provision of facilities for swimming and associated events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £327,001
Total expenditure: £335,299

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 August 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • COMAST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruth Dawson Chair 25 August 2021
SALFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Siobhan Ann Sullivan Trustee 06 February 2023
None on record
Michael Hilton Trustee 25 August 2021
None on record
Dr Sophie Parker Trustee 25 August 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £257.38k £327.00k
Total expenditure £0 £270.92k £335.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £61.00k £30.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
COMMONWEALTH POOL AQUATIC CENTRE
2 BOOTH STREET EAST
MANCHESTER
M13 9SS
Phone:
07467107630