HOMERSFIELD COMMUNITY PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote health and well being of local residents and visitors by providing an accessible open space with picnic and children's play amenities. The charity will own, maintain and improve and will work with other organisations such as the PC tp maximise the social benefit through organised activities and social events where possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 14 January 2021: CIO registration
- 07 October 2022: Funds received from 1066181 HOMERSFIELD PLAYING FIELD
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Debbie Bird | Chair | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
LUCY HAMMOND | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Lynne Elliott | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £628 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 April 2025 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 April 2025 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 May 2024 | 464 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 May 2024 | 468 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HOMERSFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. • THIS WILL BE ACHIEVED THROUGH PROVISION OF PUBLICLY ACCESSIBLE OPEN SPACE WITH PICNIC AND CHILDREN PLAY AMENITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 The Green
Homersfield
Harleston
IP20 0ET
- Phone:
- 01986788215
- Email:
- DEBBIEBIRD@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window