Accounts and annual returns STAY FOR GOOD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1192696
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2021 04 October 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 18 October 2022 18 days late