DORCAS (DAUGHTERS, OPTIMISTIC, RESPECT, COURAGE, ASSURANCE AND SUPPORT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise awareness of FGM through educational programmes for students, parents, and communities. Facilitate accredited FGM training. Provide safeguarding, counselling, advocacy, and support for survivors. Deliver early years safeguarding/body autonomy sessions. Provide holistic care and wellbeing programmes addressing abuse, physical/mental health, health disparities and other support needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Sandwell
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 12 April 2021: CIO registration
- DORCAS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cyrillia Augustin | Chair | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kayon Bailey LLB | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Oram | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nathalie Neza Bigimba | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.47k | £31.98k | £98.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.52k | £47.87k | £87.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £20.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Apr 2021 as amended on 20 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE, PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELL-BEING OF GIRLS AND WOMEN LIVING IN THE BLACK COUNTRY AND BIRMINGHAM, ESPECIALLY BY PROVISION OF: ONE TO ONE EMOTIONAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT TO WOMEN AND GIRLS AT RISK OR HAVE UNDERGONE FEMALE GENITAL MUTILATION (FGM). PROVIDING TRAINED HEALTH PROFESSIONALS TO EXPLAIN MEDICAL COMPLICATIONS OF FGM AND AVAILABLE TREATMENTS. ADVOCACY, SUPPORT AND REFERRALS TO HEALTH SERVICES AND INTERNAL COUNSELLING. PROVISION OF TRAINED INDEPENDENT DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ADVISOR TO SUPPORT SURVIVORS OF FGM. (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROVIDE INFORMATION AND RAISE AWARENESS OF FGM WITHIN THE COMMUNITY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING TO PROFESSIONALS TO UNDERSTAND FGM AND HOW TO SUPPORT VICTIMS, PARTNERSHIPS WORKING WITH GP PRACTICES, POLICE, EDUCATIONAL SETTINGS AND OTHER HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS, DELIVERY OF SCHOOL/COLLEGE/UNIVERSITY AWARENESS PROGRAMME AND BY ENGAGING WITH FAITH AND CULTURAL GROUPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Midlands House Ltd
Gipsy Lane
WILLENHALL
West Midlands
WV13 2HA
- Phone:
- 07462837349
- Email:
- dorcas@gmx.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window