ISA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship in the UK and the world, specifically in Pakistan, Turkey, Lebanon and Africa, by providing grants to organisations and individuals for the provision of emergency aid, education, training, healthcare projects and the provision of all the necessary support designed to enable individuals to generate a sustainable income and be self sufficient
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Ethiopia
- Lebanon
- Malawi
- Pakistan
- Turkey
- Uganda
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 07 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iqtasham Sunny Araf | Chair | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
NIDA RASHEED | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janed Karim | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alia Karim | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £465.70k | £2.64k | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.91k | £242.96k | £82.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2023 | 239 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2023 | 239 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
1.THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE UK AND THE WORLD, SPECIFICALLY IN PAKISTAN, TURKEY, LEBANON AND AFRICA, BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS FOR THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY AID, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND THE PROVISION OF ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 2.THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
I S A SUPPORT SERVICES
28 GEORGE STREET
BALSALL HEATH
BIRMINGHAM
B12 9RG
- Phone:
- 08444120528
- Email:
- info@isafoundation.org
- Website:
-
WWW.ISAFOUNDATION.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window