WEST BRISTOL CONCERT BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
West Bristol Concert Band (WBCB) is a community based concert band operating in and around Bristol. We have an emphasis on achieving high standards of musical performance through enjoyment and community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 12 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Steel | Chair | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julia Louise Crunden | Trustee | 09 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Eleanor Brady | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Dorothy Pettifer | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.63k | £3.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.91k | £2.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 April 2025 | 278 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 April 2025 | 278 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE ART OF MUSIC FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING AND PERFORMING CONCERT MUSIC IN THE BRISTOL AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 HENRY CORBETT ROAD
BRISTOL
BS16 1UY
- Phone:
- 07449499387
- Email:
- info.wbcb@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window