THORNTON-LE-CLAY FOSTON VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are to establish and run a village hall and to promote for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Parish of Thornton-le-Clay and Foston (area of benefit) without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, age, disability, nationality, race or political, religious or other opinions the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 08 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Hall | Chair | 17 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Martyn Smith | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Morgan | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Cox | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Jones | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.65k | £6.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.08k | £8.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.10k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 January 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 January 2024 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 January 2024 | 456 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF THORNTON-LE-CLAY AND FOSTON (“AREA OF BENEFIT”) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thornton le Clay Foston Village Hall
Low Street
Thornton le Clay
York
YO60 7TG
- Phone:
- 07900 935247
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window