REMEMBER RUFUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Remember Rufus supports the mental well-being of families following miscarriage, stillbirth, neonatal or infant death primarily through donating Cuddle Cots to NHS Trusts in England and Wales to allow families more time to say goodbye to their baby and make lasting memories.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ceri Amphlett | Chair | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Key | Trustee | 29 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/10/2021 | 23/10/2022 | 23/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.28k | £29.22k | £13.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.35k | £20.36k | £20.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 October 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 October 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 October 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 October 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PARENTS AND FAMILIES WHO HAVE SUFFERED A MISCARRIAGE, STILLBIRTH OR NEONATAL DEATH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF CUDDLECOTS AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Chapel Street
Long Lawford
RUGBY
Warwickshire
CV23 9BH
- Phone:
- 07759266968
- Email:
- rememberrufus@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window