THE ARMED FORCES' CHRISTIAN UNION (AFCU)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 March 2021: CIO registration
- 09 December 2021: Funds received from 249636 THE ARMED FORCES' CHRISTIAN UNION (AFCU)
- AFCU (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Harris | Chair | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cammy Lamb | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ellison | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Carre | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hodgkinson | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barnaby Smith | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christopher Carre | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marina Colville | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sian White | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Thompson | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Sheldon | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.38k | £262.47k | £317.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.37k | £301.91k | £370.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE AFCU ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH (ON AN INTERDENOMINATIONAL BASIS) AND THE KINGDOM OF JESUS CHRIST IN AND THROUGH THE ARMED FORCES OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND INTERNATIONALLY, AND (B) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 24
Shrivenham Hundred Business Park
Majors Road
Watchfield
SWINDON
SN6 8TZ
- Phone:
- +4401793783123
- Email:
- office@afcu.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window