HARMONY NP LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The development and promotion of educational literature promoting the spiritual and emotional well-being of children and young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 March 2021: Standard registration
- Noam Ziv (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ESTHER HOFFNER | Chair | 20 October 2020 |
|
|||||
SHERYL EVA SCHAUDER | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
GILA RUTH FISCHER | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.00k | £75.11k | £93.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.39k | £85.02k | £92.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 AUG 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL CAPACITIES AND ENABLE THEM TO BECOME RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 RICHMOND AVENUE
PRESTWICH
MANCHESTER
M25 0LZ
- Phone:
- 01617734500
- Email:
- sk@harmonynp.org
- Website:
-
noamziv.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window