WADER QUEST

Charity number: 1193674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting and supporting wader conservation. Raising awareness about the challenges waders face by; giving talks; attending events; writing a quarterly e-newsletter; writing articles; social media; running a website. Also selling merchandising; recruiting paying members. Some funding and all donations placed in a grants fund for disbursements to wader conservation projects worldwide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £15,048
Total expenditure: £12,174

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 February 2021: CIO registration
  • 13 July 2021: Funds received from 1183748 WADER QUEST
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rick SIMPSON Chair 02 March 2014
None on record
Robert Clay Trustee 24 November 2024
None on record
Louise Hathaway Trustee 24 November 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Anderson Trustee 07 November 2021
None on record
Phillip Hadley Trustee 07 November 2021
None on record
Ray Heaton Trustee 28 June 2020
None on record
ELIS SIMPSON Trustee 02 March 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £11.65k £13.56k £15.05k
Total expenditure £19.53k £12.56k £12.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 08 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 08 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 07 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 07 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Wader Quest
3rd Floor
86-90 Paul Street
London
EC2A 4NE
Phone:
07484186443