HELP THE CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote any charitable purposes for the benefit of children, by the provision of financial assistance to individuals and/or charities to relieve sickness and to promote and preserve good health, and to relieve financial hardship and advance education.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marcus Stott | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joel Farrer | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOSHUA LUKE FARRER | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 368 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 368 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 734 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 734 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1099 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1099 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN IN THE UK AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT, BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUALS AND/OR CHARITIES TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH, AND TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND ADVANCE EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OFFICE 19, JUBILEE HOUSE
EAST BEACH
LYTHAM
FY8 5FT
- Phone:
- 03300509221
- Email:
- info@helpthechildren.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window