Giving Hope to Turkey

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving Hope to Turkey is a British charity which supports organisations in Turkey with prayer and by financial grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Turkey
Governance
- 09 March 2021: Standard registration
- TURKSWORK (Working name)
- TURKSWORK TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Anne Machin Spoor | Chair | 30 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Phillips | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Allen | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Wilson | Trustee | 30 August 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £2.34k | £14.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £9.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAR 2021 as amended on 06 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN TURKEY FOR THE BENELIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH PRAYER AND BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS IN TURKEY THAT ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY AND RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF LINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Highmead
High Street
BLAKENEY
Gloucestershire
GL15 4DY
- Phone:
- 07989243115
- Email:
- liz.spoor@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window