CLEMENTHORPE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide an area for local activities to take place:- bingo, and childrens activities, healing group, theatre group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 December 1985: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Heath | Chair | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Ford | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Francine Lansdowne | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.98k | £3 | £2.47k | £4.45k | £3.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.89k | £3.24k | £3.75k | £5.14k | £5.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 March 2025 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 September 2022 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 September 2022 | 435 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUITION ADOPTED 24 SEPTEMBER 1985.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA BOUNDED BY THE RIVER OUSE, SKELDERGATE BRIDGE, BISHOPGATE STREET, BISHOPTHORPE ROAD AS FAR AS AND INCLUDING BUTCHER TERRACE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLICITAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUTENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
CLEMENTHORPE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Pavilion Row
Main Street
Fulford
YORK
YO10 4LJ
- Phone:
- 07852131163
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window