WEARSIDE IN NEED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating within Sunderland and the greater Wearside area, to provide relief to poverty; to educate and inspire; to conserve the heritage of the area; to create social cohesion and a vibrant and healthy community.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Sunderland
Governance
- 09 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Morris | Chair | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Louise Dixon | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Sarah Jane Harvey | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 836 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 836 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF SUNDERLAND AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 NORFOLK STREET
SUNNISIDE
SUNDERLAND
SR1 1EA
- Phone:
- 07842712696
- Email:
- admin@wearsideinneed.co.uk
- Website:
-
wearsideinnneed.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window