Accounts and annual returns THE OLLIE AND AMELIA CARROLL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1193373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 03 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 03 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 10 March 2024 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 10 March 2024 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 28 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 28 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window