THE OLLIE AND AMELIA CARROLL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1193373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising awareness of Battens Disease

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £4,321
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 February 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emily Scarf Chair 13 January 2021
None on record
LYNDSAY ANN Humphreys Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
Daryl Wymbs Trustee 13 January 2021
None on record
Jennifer Lambert RGN Trustee 13 January 2021
None on record
VERITY JAYNE LEVER Trustee 13 January 2021
None on record
EMMA GARTH Trustee 13 January 2021
None on record
Lucy Carroll Trustee 13 January 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.86k £13.23k £4.32k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 03 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 03 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 10 March 2024 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 10 March 2024 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 28 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 28 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
34 GLASTONBURY DRIVE
POYNTON
STOCKPORT
CHESHIRE
SK12 1EN
Phone:
07484824558
Website:

No information available